AZ SB1108 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-15 - Senate TPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriation; Crazy Creek bridge project

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriation; Crazy Creek bridge project

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-15SenateSenate TPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-0-0)
2020-01-14SenateSenate read second time
2020-01-13SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-01-13SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-01-13SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2020-01-13SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2020-01-13SenateAssigned to Senate TPS Committee
2020-01-13SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2020-01-09SenatePrefile

Subjects


Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback