AZ SB1103 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-10 - Chapter 250
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-10 - Chapter 250
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charitable tax credit; foster children
Title
Charitable tax credit; foster children
Sponsors
Sen. David Bradley [D] | Sen. Carlyle Begay [R] | Sen. Nancy Barto [R] | Sen. Don Shooter [R] |
Sen. Kimberly Yee [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-10 | Chapter 250 | |
2015-04-10 | Governor Signed | |
2015-04-06 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2015-04-03 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2015-04-03 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (50-6-4-0) |
2015-04-01 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2015-03-30 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-30 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-30 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-03-16 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to House WM Committee |
2015-03-16 | House | House read second time |
2015-03-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-03-12 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2015-03-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-0-1-0) |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Senate FIN Committee |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |