AZ SB1100 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Chapter 212
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Workers' compensation; claim settlement

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workers' compensation; claim settlement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-12SenateChapter 212
2018-04-12SenateGovernor Signed
2018-04-09SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-04-09SenateSenate final reading PASSED, voting: (19-9-2-0)
2018-04-09SenateSenate concurs
2018-04-09SenateSenate Conference Committee recommended
2018-04-09SenateSenate minority caucus: Conference
2018-04-04SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-04-04HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (43-16-1-0)
2018-04-04HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-03-20HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-20HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-19HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-03-05HouseHouse BI Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-1-0-0-0-0)
2018-02-27HouseHouse read second time
2018-02-26HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-02-26HouseAssigned to House BI Committee
2018-02-26HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-02-20HouseTransmit to House
2018-02-20SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2018-02-19SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-01-30SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-01-30SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-01-29SenateSenate consent calendar
2018-01-29SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-01-22SenateSenate COMPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0)
2018-01-11SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-10SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-10SenateAssigned to Senate COMPS Committee
2018-01-10SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
23941.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
23941.03New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69880
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1100p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1100s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1100h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0212.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1100fann1150.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.1100salman.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.1100allen j3.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/h.1100banking and insurance.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69880&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69880&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69880&billStatusActionId=181119&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69880&billStatusActionId=181241&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69880&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69880&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69880&billStatusActionId=182956&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69880&billStatusActionId=182972&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69880&billStatusActionId=183121&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69880&billStatusActionId=183155&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback