AZ SB1099 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-13)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-27 - House third reading FAILED voting: (25-35-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Patriotic youth groups; school access

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Patriotic youth groups; school access

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-27HouseHouse third reading FAILED voting: (25-35-0-0)
2019-05-27HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2019-05-24HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-05-24HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-05-24HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
2019-03-18HouseHouse ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-2-0-1-0-0)
2019-02-27HouseHouse read second time
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to House ED Committee
2019-02-26HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2019-02-14HouseTransmit to House
2019-02-14SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-1-0-0)
2019-02-12SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-12SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-11SenateSenate consent calendar
2019-02-11SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-02-05SenateSenate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0)
2019-01-23SenateSenate read second time
2019-01-22SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-01-22SenateAssigned to Senate ED Committee
2019-01-22SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15119New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71462
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1099p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1099s.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71462&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71462&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71462&billStatusActionId=186512&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71462&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71462&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71462&billStatusActionId=189915&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71462&billStatusActionId=189966&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback