AZ SB1099 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-13)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-27 - House third reading FAILED voting: (25-35-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-27 - House third reading FAILED voting: (25-35-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Patriotic youth groups; school access
Title
Patriotic youth groups; school access
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-27 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (25-35-0-0) |
2019-05-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2019-05-24 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-05-24 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-05-24 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2019-03-18 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-2-0-1-0-0) |
2019-02-27 | House | House read second time |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-02-14 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-1-0-0) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Civic Involvement
Education - Title 15
Patriotic Society
Patriotic Youth Groups
School Access
School Instruction
Education - Title 15
Patriotic Society
Patriotic Youth Groups
School Access
School Instruction