AZ SB1099 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - House WM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Liability threshold; estimated TPT payments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Liability threshold; estimated TPT payments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-21 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21HouseHouse WM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
2018-03-06HouseHouse read second time
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to House WM Committee
2018-03-05HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-03-01HouseTransmit to House
2018-03-01SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2018-02-28SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-22SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-22SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-22SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-02-20SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-0-2-0)
2018-02-14SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2018-01-11SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-10SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-10SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
48831Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69878
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1099p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1099s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.1099fann1.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1099approps.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.1099ugenti-rita1.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/h.1099ways and means.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69878&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69878&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69878&billStatusActionId=182122&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69878&billStatusActionId=182205&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69878&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2

Bill Comments

feedback