AZ SB1098 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Senate consent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Unused tax credit; termination; time

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unused tax credit; termination; time

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-21SenateSenate consent calendar
2020-01-21SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2020-01-15SenateSenate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-1-0)
2020-01-14SenateSenate read second time
2020-01-13SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-01-13SenateAssigned to Senate FIN Committee
2020-01-13SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2020-01-09SenatePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
43224Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback