AZ SB1098 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-16)
Status: Passed on May 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-14 - Chapter 287
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Industrial hemp; licensing

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Industrial hemp; licensing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Land, Agriculture and Rural Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-14SenateChapter 287
2018-05-14SenateGovernor Signed
2018-05-04SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-05-03SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-05-03HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (56-3-1-0)
2018-05-03HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2018-05-02HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-05-02HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-05-02HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-03-08HouseHouse LARA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-02-20HouseHouse read second time
2018-02-19HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-02-19HouseAssigned to House LARA Committee
2018-02-19HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-02-15HouseTransmit to House
2018-02-15SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0)
2018-02-15SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-13SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-13SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-12SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-02-06SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-1-1-0)
2018-01-17SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-2-0-0)
2018-01-11SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-10SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-10SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2018-01-10SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2018-01-10SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
133405Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411758Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411758.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411758.07Amended CodeSee Bill Text
41619.51Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69874
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1098p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1098s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0287.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.1098 borrelli.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1098gov.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.10980921.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1098approps.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1098rules.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1098borrelli0824.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69874&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69874&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69874&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69874&billStatusActionId=180864&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69874&billStatusActionId=180905&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69874&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69874&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#4
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69874&billStatusActionId=183607&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69874&billStatusActionId=183713&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback