AZ SB1097 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Chapter 30
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Chapter 30
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Truck routes; designation
Title
Truck routes; designation
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Carroll [R] | Sen. David Gowan [R] | Sen. Janae Shamp [R] | Rep. David Cook [R] |
Rep. David Livingston [R] | Rep. Justin Wilmeth [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - House Transportation & Infrastructure Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - House Transportation & Infrastructure Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-11 | Senate | Chapter 30 |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2023-04-04 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (50-9-1-0) |
2023-03-28 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-03-28 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-03-27 | House | House consent calendar |
2023-03-27 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-03-16 | House | House TI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-1-0-0-0-0) |
2023-03-08 | House | House read second time |
2023-03-07 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-03-07 | House | Assigned to House TI Committee |
2023-03-07 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2023-03-02 | House | Transmit to House |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (24-4-2-0) |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate TAT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-0) |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TAT Committee |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Amend
Conflict
Definitions
Designation
Highway
Highway Use
Invalid
Local Ordinances
Repeal
Restriction On Highway Usage
Streets
Transportation - Title 28
Truck Routes
Vehicle Load
Vehicle Size
Vehicle Weight
Conflict
Definitions
Designation
Highway
Highway Use
Invalid
Local Ordinances
Repeal
Restriction On Highway Usage
Streets
Transportation - Title 28
Truck Routes
Vehicle Load
Vehicle Size
Vehicle Weight