AZ SB1095 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Controlled substances; schedule designations
Title
Controlled substances; schedule designations
Sponsors
Sen. Tyler Pace [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-03-03 | House | House read second time |
2020-03-02 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-03-02 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2020-03-02 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-02-06 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-1-1-0) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Prefile |
Subjects
Controlled Substances
Criminal Code - Title 13
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Rules
Scheduled Designations
Uniform Controlled Substances Act
Criminal Code - Title 13
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Rules
Scheduled Designations
Uniform Controlled Substances Act
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 3412 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 3412.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 3451 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1901 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1969 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 2901 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 2933 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2511 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2512 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2513 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2514 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2515 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2516 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2531 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2608 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |