AZ SB1091 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Chapter 43
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Nuclear emergency appropriations; assessments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nuclear emergency appropriations; assessments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-22SenateChapter 43
2017-03-22SenateGovernor Signed
2017-03-21SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-03-20SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-03-20HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (57-0-3-0)
2017-03-14HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-14HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-13HouseHouse consent calendar
2017-03-13HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2017-03-01HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-0-0-3-0-0)
2017-02-21HouseHouse read second time
2017-02-20HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-02-20HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2017-02-20HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2017-02-02HouseTransmit to House
2017-02-02SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2017-01-31SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-01-31SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-01-30SenateSenate consent calendar
2017-01-30SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-01-24SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0)
2017-01-18SenateSenate read second time
2017-01-17SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-01-17SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2017-01-17SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
26306.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
26306.02Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/68725
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1091p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1091s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/laws/0043.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68725&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68725&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68725&billStatusActionId=174153&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68725&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68725&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68725&billStatusActionId=176559&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback