AZ SB1091 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Chapter 81
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Homeowners' associations; removal; special meetings

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Homeowners' associations; removal; special meetings

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - House Government and Higher Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-30 Chapter 81
2015-03-30 Governor Signed
2015-03-24 Transmitted to Governor
2015-03-24SenateSenate final reading , voting: (28-0-2-0)
2015-03-24SenateSenate Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2015-03-24SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2015-03-24SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2015-03-19HouseTransmit to Senate
2015-03-18HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (53-4-3-0)
2015-03-17HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2015-03-17HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2015-03-17HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2015-03-16HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0)
2015-02-26HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2015-03-12HouseHouse GHE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0)
2015-03-02HouseReferred to House GHE Committee
2015-03-02HouseHouse read second time
2015-02-26HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2015-02-26HouseAssigned to House GHE Committee
2015-02-26HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2015-02-19SenateTransmit to House
2015-02-19SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0)
2015-02-17SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2015-02-17SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2015-02-16SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
2015-01-21SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2015-02-11SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2015-01-22SenateReferred to Senate GOV Committee
2015-01-22SenateSenate read second time
2015-01-21SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2015-01-21SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2015-01-21SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.azleg.gov/DocumentsForBill.asp?Session_ID=114&Bill_Number=SB1091
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/bills/sb1091p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/bills/sb1091s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/bills/sb1091h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/laws/0081.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/proposed/s.1091jk.doc.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/bills/sb1091.sgov.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/bills/sb1091.sthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/bills/sb1091.hghe.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/bills/sb1091.hrules.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/bills/sb1091.hthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/bills/sb1091.sfinal.1.asp

Bill Comments

feedback