AZ SB1090 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Chapter 107
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Chapter 107
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Emergency voting procedures; board action
Title
Emergency voting procedures; board action
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Elections Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Elections Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | Senate | Chapter 107 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (16-13-1-0) |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate minority caucus |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-04-08 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-27-2-0) |
2019-04-08 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-04-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2019-03-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-25 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2019-03-19 | House | House ELECT Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-06 | House | House read second time |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to House ELECT Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-02-27 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0) |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Board Actions
Elections And Electors
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Emergency Voting
Emergency Voting Procedures
Voting
Elections And Electors
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Emergency Voting
Emergency Voting Procedures
Voting
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 246 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 411 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 542 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 549 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |