AZ SB1090 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-4)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Chapter 211
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Beirut barracks bombing remembrance day

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Beirut barracks bombing remembrance day

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House Military, Veterans and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-12SenateChapter 211
2018-04-12SenateGovernor Signed
2018-04-09SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-04-09SenateSenate final reading PASSED, voting: (28-0-2-0)
2018-04-09SenateSenate concurs
2018-04-09SenateSenate Conference Committee recommended
2018-04-09SenateSenate minority caucus: Conference
2018-04-04SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-04-04HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0)
2018-04-04HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-03-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2018-03-06HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-06HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-05HouseHouse Committee of the Whole consent calendar
2018-03-05HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-02-26HouseHouse MVRA Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-02-20HouseHouse read second time
2018-02-19HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-02-19HouseAssigned to House MVRA Committee
2018-02-19HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-02-01HouseTransmit to House
2018-02-01SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0)
2018-01-30SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-01-30SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-01-29SenateSenate consent calendar
2018-01-29SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-01-22SenateSenate COMPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0)
2018-01-11SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-10SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-10SenateAssigned to Senate COMPS Committee
2018-01-10SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1316New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69853
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1090p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1090s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1090h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0211.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.1090lawrence.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/h.1090military veterans and regulatory affairs.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69853&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69853&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69853&billStatusActionId=180064&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69853&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69853&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69853&billStatusActionId=182628&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69853&billStatusActionId=182950&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69853&billStatusActionId=182970&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69853&billStatusActionId=183151&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69853&billStatusActionId=183120&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback