AZ SB1089 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 25-7)
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Chapter 24
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Purple heart day

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Purple heart day

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House Military, Veterans and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-16SenateChapter 24
2018-03-16SenateGovernor Signed
2018-03-14SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-03-13SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-03-13HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0)
2018-03-06HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-06HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-05HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-03-05HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-02-26HouseHouse MVRA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-02-20HouseHouse read second time
2018-02-19HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-02-19HouseAssigned to House MVRA Committee
2018-02-19HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-02-01HouseTransmit to House
2018-02-01SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0)
2018-01-30SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-01-30SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-01-29SenateSenate consent calendar
2018-01-29SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-01-22SenateSenate COMPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0)
2018-01-11SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-10SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-10SenateAssigned to Senate COMPS Committee
2018-01-10SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1316New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69852
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1089p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1089s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0024.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69852&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69852&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69852&billStatusActionId=180062&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69852&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69852&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69852&billStatusActionId=182442&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback