AZ SB1086 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-25 - Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-1-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriation; unfunded liability; PSPRS; CORP

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriation; unfunded liability; PSPRS; CORP

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-25SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-1-0)
2022-01-11SenateSenate read second time
2022-01-10SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2022-01-10SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2022-01-10SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2022-01-05SenatePrefile

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback