AZ SB1085 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-26 - House read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-26 - House read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
AHCCCS; naturopathic physicians
Title
AHCCCS; naturopathic physicians
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Barto [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-26 | House | House read second time |
2018-02-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-02-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-02-22 | House | Assigned to House HEALTH Committee |
2018-02-22 | House | Assigned to House HEALTH Committee |
2018-02-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2018-02-21 | House | Transmit to House |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-2-0-0) |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Ahcccs
Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System
Naturopathic Medicine
Naturopathic Physicians
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System
Naturopathic Medicine
Naturopathic Physicians
Public Health And Safety - Title 36