AZ SB1084 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
State of emergency; automatic termination
Title
State of emergency; automatic termination
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-31 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-31 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-03-31 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-25 | House | House GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-6-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-22 | House | House read second time |
2021-03-18 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | Assigned to House GE Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-03-04 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0) |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Automatic Termination
Concurrent Resolution
Emergency Management
Military Affairs And Emergency Management - Title 26
State Of Emergency
Termination
Concurrent Resolution
Emergency Management
Military Affairs And Emergency Management - Title 26
State Of Emergency
Termination