AZ SB1083 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-14 - Chapter 145
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-14 - Chapter 145
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
ASRS; modifications
Title
ASRS; modifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 145 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-04-07 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (51-1-8-0) |
2022-03-29 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-29 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-28 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-03-28 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2022-03-02 | House | House GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-0-0-2-0-0) |
2022-02-24 | House | House read second time |
2022-02-23 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Assigned to House GE Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-01-28 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-0-3-0) |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-2-0) |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Prefile |
Subjects
Arizona State Retirement System (asrs)
Asrs (see Also: Arizona State Retirement System)
Charter Schools
Definitions
Education - Title 15
Employer Contributions
Employment Benefits
Modifications
Powers And Duties
Public Officers And Employees - Title 38
Teachers
Asrs (see Also: Arizona State Retirement System)
Charter Schools
Definitions
Education - Title 15
Employer Contributions
Employment Benefits
Modifications
Powers And Duties
Public Officers And Employees - Title 38
Teachers
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 187 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 711 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 714 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 737 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 740 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 741 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 747 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 750 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 757 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 758 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 760 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 762 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 763 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 764 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 766 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 768 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 770 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 775 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 781 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 797.06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 797.07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 797.09 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 921 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |