AZ SB1083 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Chapter 130
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Schools; recess periods

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; recess periods

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-05SenateChapter 130
2018-04-05SenateGovernor Signed
2018-04-02SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-04-02SenateSenate final reading PASSED, voting: (27-3-0-0)
2018-04-02SenateSenate concurs
2018-04-02SenateSenate Conference Committee recommended
2018-04-02SenateSenate minority caucus: Conference
2018-03-28SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-03-28HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (57-1-2-0)
2018-03-28HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-03-06HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-06HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-05HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-03-05HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-02-26HouseHouse ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-1-0-0)
2018-02-20HouseHouse read second time
2018-02-19HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-02-19HouseAssigned to House ED Committee
2018-02-19HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-02-12HouseTransmit to House
2018-02-12SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (26-3-1-0)
2018-02-08SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-01-23SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-01-23SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-01-22SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-01-18SenateSenate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2018-01-10SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-09SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-09SenateAssigned to Senate ED Committee
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15118New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69822
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1083p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1083s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1083h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0130.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.10831203.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1083ed.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1083rules.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.1083udall.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69822&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69822&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69822&billStatusActionId=180515&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69822&billStatusActionId=180608&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69822&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69822&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69822&billStatusActionId=182719&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69822&billStatusActionId=182770&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69822&billStatusActionId=182849&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69822&billStatusActionId=182859&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback