AZ SB1080 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

TPT; use tax; education

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TPT; use tax; education

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-02-26SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-26SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-25SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-01-22SenateSenate read second time
2019-01-22SenateSenate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-0-0)
2019-01-17SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-01-17SenateAssigned to Senate ED Committee
2019-01-17SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
151409Amended CodeSee Bill Text
151472Amended CodeSee Bill Text
151648Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15185Amended CodeSee Bill Text
152084Amended CodeSee Bill Text
152085Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15241Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15241.02Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15971Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15977Amended CodeSee Bill Text
425010.01Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
425029Amended CodeSee Bill Text
425029.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
425029.02Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
425032.03New CodeSee Bill Text
425155Amended CodeSee Bill Text
431072.02Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
43222Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43323Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71232
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1080p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1080s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/s.10800914.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/s.1080allen.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.1080ed.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.1080floorbrophy mcgee.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71232&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71232&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71232&billStatusActionId=187601&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback