AZ SB1080 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Chapter 209
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Teenage drivers; communication devices prohibited

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Teenage drivers; communication devices prohibited

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-27SenateChapter 209
2017-04-27SenateGovernor Signed
2017-04-24SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-04-20SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-04-20HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (32-24-3-0)
2017-04-19HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2017-04-18HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-04-18HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-04-17HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
2017-03-01HouseHouse TI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-0-0-0-0)
2017-02-21HouseHouse read second time
2017-02-20HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-02-20HouseAssigned to House TI Committee
2017-02-20HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2017-02-13HouseTransmit to House
2017-02-13SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (24-6-0-0)
2017-02-09SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-02-07SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-01-31SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-01-30SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-01-24SenateSenate TRANSIT Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-1-0-0)
2017-01-18SenateSenate read second time
2017-01-17SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-01-17SenateAssigned to Senate TRANSIT Committee
2017-01-17SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
283154Amended CodeSee Bill Text
283174Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/68707
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1080p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1080s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/laws/0209.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/s.1080transit.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/s.1080fann.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/s.10800413.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68707&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68707&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68707&billStatusActionId=174678&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68707&billStatusActionId=174507&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68707&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68707&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68707&billStatusActionId=177082&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68707&billStatusActionId=177128&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback