AZ SB1079 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Chapter 192
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Chapter 192
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
ASRS; long-term disability program
Title
ASRS; long-term disability program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | Senate | Chapter 192 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-05-01 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0) |
2019-03-19 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-19 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-18 | House | House consent calendar |
2019-03-18 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-07 | House | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-2-0-0) |
2019-02-27 | House | House read second time |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-02-14 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0) |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Asrs
Long-term Disability Program
Ltd Program Eligibility
Public Officers And Employees - Title 38
Repeal
Long-term Disability Program
Ltd Program Eligibility
Public Officers And Employees - Title 38
Repeal
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 797 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 797.07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |