AZ SB1077 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-19 - Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0)
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Feb 1 @ 2:00 pm in SHR 109
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

AHCCCS; chiropractic care; report

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AHCCCS; chiropractic care; report

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-19SenateSenate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0)
2022-01-11SenateSenate read second time
2022-01-10SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2022-01-10SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2022-01-10SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2022-01-10SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2022-01-05SenatePrefile

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
362907Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback