AZ SB1075 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 158
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 158
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Incompetent defendant; guardian appointment; costs
Title
Incompetent defendant; guardian appointment; costs
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Barto [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | Senate | Chapter 158 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-04-12 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (55-0-5-0) |
2022-03-29 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-29 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-28 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-03-28 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2022-03-16 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-09 | House | House read second time |
2022-03-08 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-03-08 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2022-03-08 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-02-17 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Prefile |
Subjects
Compensation
Conservator
Costs
Criminal Code - Title 13
Guardian Ad Litem
Guardian Appointment
Incapacitated Person
Incompetence To Stand Trial
Incompetent Defendants
Protective Order
Conservator
Costs
Criminal Code - Title 13
Guardian Ad Litem
Guardian Appointment
Incapacitated Person
Incompetence To Stand Trial
Incompetent Defendants
Protective Order