AZ SB1073 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Chapter 116
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Chapter 116
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
School district consolidations
Title
School district consolidations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DISC/ONLY) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DISC/ONLY) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-22 | Senate | Chapter 116 |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (17-13-0-0) |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (53-7-0-0) |
2019-04-11 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-04-02 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-04-02 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-04-01 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2019-04-01 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-25 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (12-0-0-1-0-0) |
2019-03-19 | House | House read second time |
2019-03-18 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-03-14 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (17-13-0-0) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-0-0) |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Appropriating Monies
Career Technical Education Districts
Education - Title 15
Repeal
School District Consolidations
Career Technical Education Districts
Education - Title 15
Repeal
School District Consolidations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 397 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 459 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |