AZ SB1068 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - House RULES Committee action: Discussed and Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Elections manual; legislative council

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections manual; legislative council

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-31 - House - House Rules Committee Action (DISC/HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-31HouseHouse RULES Committee action: Discussed and Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-03-25HouseHouse GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-6-0-0-0-0)
2021-03-10HouseHouse read second time
2021-03-09HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-03-09HouseAssigned to House GE Committee
2021-03-09HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2021-03-04HouseTransmit to House
2021-03-03SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0)
2021-02-24SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-02-09SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-09SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-08SenateSenate consent calendar
2021-02-08SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-02-01SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0)
2021-01-12SenateSenate read second time
2021-01-11SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-01-11SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2021-01-11SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2021-01-08SenatePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16452Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411056.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411057Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/74390
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1068p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1068s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/s.1068ugenti-rita1034.docx.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/482006
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/485662
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487699
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/488118
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74390&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74390&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74390&billStatusActionId=201676&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74390&billStatusActionId=202526&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74390&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74390&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3

Bill Comments 750

feedback