AZ SB1067 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Chapter 116
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Chapter 116
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Study committee; animal control standards
Title
Study committee; animal control standards
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | Senate | Chapter 116 |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2023-04-25 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (33-25-1-0) |
2023-04-04 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-04-04 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-04-04 | House | House consent calendar |
2023-04-04 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-03-27 | House | House LARA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-0-1-0-0) |
2023-02-28 | House | House read second time |
2023-02-27 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-02-27 | House | Assigned to House LARA Committee |
2023-02-27 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2023-02-21 | House | Transmit to House |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (23-6-1-0) |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Animal Control
Animal Control Standards (h)
Delayed Repeal
Duties
Joint Study Committee On Statewide Animal Control Standards
Membership
Report
Standards
Study Committee
Animal Control Standards (h)
Delayed Repeal
Duties
Joint Study Committee On Statewide Animal Control Standards
Membership
Report
Standards
Study Committee