AZ SB1066 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Senate Conference Committee recommended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Manufactured housing; construction; definitions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Manufactured housing; construction; definitions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-09 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14SenateSenate Conference Committee recommended
2019-05-14SenateSenate minority caucus: Conference
2019-05-09SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-05-09HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0)
2019-05-09HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-04-09HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-09HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-08HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-2-0-0-0-0)
2019-03-19HouseHouse COM Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-03-07HouseHouse read second time
2019-03-06HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-03-06HouseAssigned to House COM Committee
2019-03-06HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2019-02-06HouseTransmit to House
2019-02-06SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2019-01-29SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-01-29SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-01-28SenateSenate consent calendar
2019-01-28SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-01-22SenateSenate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0)
2019-01-17SenateSenate read second time
2019-01-16SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-01-16SenateAssigned to Senate ED Committee
2019-01-16SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15249.14New CodeSee Bill Text
281095Amended CodeSee Bill Text
414001Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71167
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1066p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1066s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1066h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/h.1066weninger2.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/h.1066commerce.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71167&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71167&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71167&billStatusActionId=185995&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71167&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71167&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71167&billStatusActionId=189519&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71167&billStatusActionId=189521&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback