AZ SB1064 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Chapter 29
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Chapter 29
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Hualapai tribe special plates
Title
Hualapai tribe special plates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | Senate | Chapter 29 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-03-17 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (45-13-2-0) |
2022-03-15 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-15 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-14 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-03-14 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2022-03-09 | House | House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-1-0-2-0-0) |
2022-03-02 | House | House read second time |
2022-03-01 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | Assigned to House TRANS Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-02-24 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-1-2-0) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate TAT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0) |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TAT Committee |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Prefile |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 2351 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 2403 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 2470.10 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6991 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6993 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |