AZ SB1063 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Chapter 170
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Chapter 170
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Political signs; removal; elections
Title
Political signs; removal; elections
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - House - House Municipal Oversight & Elections Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - House - House Municipal Oversight & Elections Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Chapter 170 |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (20-8-2-0) |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-04-03 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-1-0-0) |
2024-03-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-03-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-25 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-20 | House | House MOE Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-1-0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-27 | House | House read second time |
2024-02-26 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-02-26 | House | Assigned to House MOE Committee |
2024-02-26 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-02-21 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (23-5-2-0) |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Senate ELEC Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ELEC Committee |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Classification
Definitions
Elections
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Political Signs
Printed Materials
Removal
Tampering
Violation
Definitions
Elections
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Political Signs
Printed Materials
Removal
Tampering
Violation