AZ SB1063 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Chapter 281
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Administrative review of agency decisions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Administrative review of agency decisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-26SenateChapter 281
2021-04-26SenateGovernor Signed
2021-04-26SenateTransmitted to Governor
2021-04-19SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-04-19HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (31-29-0-0)
2021-04-19HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2021-03-31HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-31HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-29HouseHouse consent calendar
2021-03-29HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-03-23HouseHouse COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0)
2021-03-15HouseHouse read second time
2021-03-11HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-03-11HouseAssigned to House COM Committee
2021-03-11HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2021-03-04HouseTransmit to House
2021-03-03SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0)
2021-02-24SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2021-02-16SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-16SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-15SenateSenate consent calendar
2021-02-15SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-02-08SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0)
2021-01-12SenateSenate read second time
2021-01-11SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-01-11SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2021-01-11SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2021-01-06SenatePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
12910Amended CodeSee Bill Text
283317Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/74370
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1063p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1063s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/laws/0281.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/483092
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487579
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487998
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/489106
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74370&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74370&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74370&billStatusActionId=201650&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74370&billStatusActionId=202525&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74370&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74370&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74370&billStatusActionId=203749&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74370&billStatusActionId=203766&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments 750

feedback