AZ SB1063 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Chapter 235
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Chapter 235
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
PSPRS; risk pool
Title
PSPRS; risk pool
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Chapter 235 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-04-20 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (55-0-4-0) |
2017-04-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-03-28 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-28 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2017-03-27 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2017-03-20 | House | House BI Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-0-2-0-0) |
2017-03-07 | House | House read second time |
2017-03-06 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-03-06 | House | Assigned to House BI Committee |
2017-03-06 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2017-03-01 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-3-0-0) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (9-0-1-0) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Excise Tax
Payment Method
Payments
Psprs
Public Officers And Employees
Public Safety Personnel Retirement System
Risk Pool
Taxation
Technical Correction
Transaction Privilege Tax
Payment Method
Payments
Psprs
Public Officers And Employees
Public Safety Personnel Retirement System
Risk Pool
Taxation
Technical Correction
Transaction Privilege Tax
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 842.02 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 843 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 846.05 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 861 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5018 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |