AZ SB1058 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-17 - House majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-17 - House majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
CORP; nondesignated positions
Title
CORP; nondesignated positions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - House Government and Higher Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - House Government and Higher Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-17 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-16 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2015-03-03 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-03-12 | House | House GHE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred to House GHE Committee |
2015-03-04 | House | House read second time |
2015-03-03 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Assigned to House GHE Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-0-0) |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Senate FIN Committee |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |