AZ SB1056 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Chapter 144
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Municipal codes; publication; online

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Municipal codes; publication; online

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Local and International Affairs Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-10SenateChapter 144
2017-04-10SenateGovernor Signed
2017-04-06SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-04-05SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-04-05HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0)
2017-03-28HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-28HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-27HouseHouse consent calendar
2017-03-27HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
2017-03-22HouseHouse LIA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-1-0-0)
2017-02-23HouseHouse read second time
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to House LIA Committee
2017-02-22HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2017-01-26HouseTransmit to House
2017-01-26SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2017-01-24SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-01-24SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-01-23SenateSenate consent calendar
2017-01-23SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-01-18SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2017-01-12SenateSenate read second time
2017-01-11SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-01-11SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2017-01-11SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
9801Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/68568
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1056p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1056s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/laws/0144.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68568&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68568&billStatusActionId=173528&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68568&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68568&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68568&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68568&billStatusActionId=176851&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback