AZ SB1056 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-05 - Referred to House JUD Committee
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Class G licensees; communication devices

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Class G licensees; communication devices

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-18 - Senate - Senate Public Safety and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-05 Referred to House JUD Committee
2012-03-05 House read second time
2012-03-02 Assigned to House RULES Committee
2012-03-02 Assigned to House JUD Committee
2012-03-02 Introduced in House and read first time
2012-01-26 Transmit to House
2012-01-26 Senate third reading PASSED voting: (23-6-1-0)
2012-01-26 Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2012-01-23 Senate Consent Calendar January 23, 2012 @ 2:10 PM with Objections
2012-01-24 Senate majority caucus: Do pass
2012-01-24 Senate minority caucus: Do pass
2012-01-23 Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
2012-01-10 Referred to Senate RULES Committee
2012-01-18 Senate PSHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-0-2-0)
2012-01-11 Referred to Senate PSHS Committee
2012-01-11 Senate read second time
2012-01-10 Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
2012-01-10 Assigned to Senate PSHS Committee
2012-01-10 Introduced in Senate and read first time

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback