AZ SB1054 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Chapter 210
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

ASRS; nonparticipating employers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ASRS; nonparticipating employers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-12SenateChapter 210
2018-04-12SenateGovernor Signed
2018-04-09SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-04-05SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-04-05HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0)
2018-04-03HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-04-03HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-04-02HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-04-02HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-03-12HouseHouse BI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-0-0-0-0)
2018-03-06HouseHouse read second time
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to House BI Committee
2018-03-05HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-03-01HouseTransmit to House
2018-02-28SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-1-0-0)
2018-02-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-20SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-20SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-02-14SenateSenate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-1-0-0)
2018-01-09SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-08SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-08SenateAssigned to Senate FIN Committee
2018-01-08SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-01-03SenatePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
38751Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69727
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1054p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1054s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0210.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.1054fann.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1054fin.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69727&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69727&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69727&billStatusActionId=181915&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69727&billStatusActionId=182124&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69727&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69727&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69727&billStatusActionId=183044&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback