AZ SB1054 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-23 - House read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-23 - House read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic accidents; fatality; implied consent
Title
Traffic accidents; fatality; implied consent
Sponsors
Rep. Judy Burges [R] | Sen. Sylvia Allen [R] | Sen. David Farnsworth [R] | Rep. Steve Montenegro [R] |
Rep. Franklin Pratt [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-23 | House | House read second time |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to House JPS Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to House JPS Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2017-02-16 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (26-3-1-0) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |