AZ SB1049 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-23 - Introduced in House and read first time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-23 - Introduced in House and read first time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Parents' bill of rights; violation
Title
Parents' bill of rights; violation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-23 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-02-25 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-12-2-0) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0) |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-12-27 | Senate | Prefile |
Subjects
Charter Schools
Civil Penalty
General Provisions - Title 1
Legal Standing
Parental Enforcement
Parental Rights (h)
Parents Bill Of Rights
Parents Rights
School Districts
Violation
Violations (h)
Civil Penalty
General Provisions - Title 1
Legal Standing
Parental Enforcement
Parental Rights (h)
Parents Bill Of Rights
Parents Rights
School Districts
Violation
Violations (h)