AZ SB1048 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-20 - Assigned to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Schools; employees; employment; discipline.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; employees; employment; discipline.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-20HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-05-20HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2020-01-30HouseTransmit to House
2020-01-30SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2020-01-28SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2020-01-28SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2020-01-27SenateSenate consent calendar
2020-01-27SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2020-01-21SenateSenate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0)
2020-01-14SenateSenate read second time
2020-01-13SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-01-13SenateAssigned to Senate ED Committee
2020-01-13SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2020-01-06SenatePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15183Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15251Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15350Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15505New CodeSee Bill Text
15512Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15514Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15534.02Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15534.04Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15550Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback