AZ SB1047 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - Senate JUD Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - Senate JUD Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Class III gaming; revenue distribution
Title
Class III gaming; revenue distribution
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-23 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Prefile |
Subjects
Amusements And Sports - Title 5
Class Iii Gaming
Gambling
Gaming
Indian Reservations
Revenue Distribution
Class Iii Gaming
Gambling
Gaming
Indian Reservations
Revenue Distribution