AZ SB1046 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Juvenile corrections; discharge; ICE detainers
Title
Juvenile corrections; discharge; ICE detainers
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Gray [R] | Sen. Don Shooter [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - Senate - Senate Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-19 - Senate - Senate Public Safety and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - Senate - Senate Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-19 - Senate - Senate Public Safety and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-15 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-14 | Senate final reading , voting: (28-1-1-0) | |
2011-04-14 | Senate Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2011-04-14 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-14 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-14 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-04-13 | House third reading , voting: (43-15-2-0) | |
2011-04-12 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-04-06 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-06 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-04 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2011-02-21 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-17 | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-0-1-0) | |
2011-02-21 | Referred to House JUD Committee | |
2011-03-02 | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) | |
2011-02-22 | Referred to House MAPS Committee | |
2011-02-22 | House read second time | |
2011-02-21 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-21 | Assigned to House JUD Committee | |
2011-02-21 | Assigned to House MAPS Committee | |
2011-02-21 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2011-01-27 | Transmit to House | |
2011-01-27 | Senate third reading , voting: (26-2-2-0) | |
2011-01-26 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2011-01-24 | Senate Consent Calendar January 24, 2011 @ 2:45 PM with Objections | |
2011-01-25 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-01-25 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-01-24 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-01-10 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-01-20 | Senate BSFSS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-0) | |
2011-01-10 | Referred to Senate BSFSS Committee | |
2011-01-19 | Senate PSHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-0) | |
2011-01-11 | Referred to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2011-01-11 | Senate read second time | |
2011-01-10 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-01-10 | Assigned to Senate BSFSS Committee | |
2011-01-10 | Assigned to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2011-01-10 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |