AZ SB1044 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - House MVA Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Veterans' services; benefits counselors; appropriation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterans' services; benefits counselors; appropriation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-02 - House - House Military & Veterans Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-02HouseHouse MVA Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0-0-0)
2020-02-26HouseHouse read second time
2020-02-25HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-02-25HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2020-02-25HouseAssigned to House MVA Committee
2020-02-25HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2020-02-04HouseTransmit to House
2020-02-04SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2020-02-03SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2020-01-28SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2020-01-28SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2020-01-27SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2020-01-21SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0)
2020-01-15SenateSenate TPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0)
2020-01-14SenateSenate read second time
2020-01-13SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-01-13SenateAssigned to Senate TPS Committee
2020-01-13SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2020-01-13SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2020-01-06SenatePrefile

Subjects


Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/72623
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/sb1044p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/sb1044s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/proposed/s.10440206.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/s.1044tps.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/proposed/s.10441126.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/s.1044approp.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/proposed/h.1044lawrence.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/h.1044military veterans affairs.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72623&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72623&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72623&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72623&billStatusActionId=192516&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72623&billStatusActionId=192720&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72623&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3

Bill Comments

feedback