AZ SB1043 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Chapter 143
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Chapter 143
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
County recorder; recording fees
Title
County recorder; recording fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Local and International Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Local and International Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | Senate | Chapter 143 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (19-11-0-0) |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Senate minority caucus |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2018-03-27 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (51-7-2-0) |
2018-03-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-03-06 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-03-06 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-03-05 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2018-03-05 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0) |
2018-02-28 | House | House LIA Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-0-0-2-0-0) |
2018-02-20 | House | House read second time |
2018-02-19 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-02-19 | House | Assigned to House LIA Committee |
2018-02-19 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2018-02-01 | House | Transmit to House |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (23-5-2-0) |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2017-12-21 | Senate | Prefile |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 1132 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 475 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 475.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 208 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |