AZ SB1042 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Chapter 245
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Teacher certification; reciprocity

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Teacher certification; reciprocity

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 22 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-02SenateChapter 245
2017-05-02SenateGovernor Signed
2017-04-26SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-04-26SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-04-26HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (33-22-5-0)
2017-04-25HouseTransmit to House
2017-04-25SenateSenate final reading PASSED, voting: (16-12-2-0)
2017-04-25SenateSenate Conference adopted
2017-04-25HouseHouse Conference adopted
2017-04-24HouseHouse Conference caucus date
2017-04-20SenateSenate Conference caucus date
2017-04-19SenateSenate Minority report
2017-04-19SenateSenate Conference report: That the Senate accept the House amendments with exceptions and the bill be further amended.
2017-04-19HouseHouse Minority report
2017-04-18HouseHouse Conference members: BOYER, ALSTON, CARTER
2017-04-18HouseHouse Conference appointed
2017-04-18SenateSenate Conference members: ALLEN S, MIRANDA, SMITH
2017-04-18SenateSenate Conference appointed
2017-04-18SenateSenate Conference Committee recommended
2017-04-18SenateSenate minority caucus: Conference
2017-04-17SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-04-17HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (36-22-1-0)
2017-04-13HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-04-04HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-04-04HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-04-03HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0)
2017-03-06HouseHouse ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-2-0-1-0-0)
2017-02-21HouseHouse read second time
2017-02-20HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-02-20HouseAssigned to House ED Committee
2017-02-20HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2017-02-06HouseTransmit to House
2017-02-06SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (17-13-0-0)
2017-01-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-01-24SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-01-24SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-01-23SenateSenate consent calendar
2017-01-23SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-01-19SenateSenate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-0)
2017-01-11SenateSenate read second time
2017-01-10SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-01-10SenateAssigned to Senate ED Committee
2017-01-10SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15183Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15532Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15533Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15553New CodeSee Bill Text
15782.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/68499
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1042p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1042s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1042h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1042c.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/laws/0245.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/s.1042allen0935.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/h.1042boyer.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/h.1042education.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/ccamendments/53leg/1r/s.10420320.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68499&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68499&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68499&billStatusActionId=174230&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68499&billStatusActionId=173535&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68499&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68499&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68499&billStatusActionId=176974&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68499&billStatusActionId=177003&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68499&billStatusActionId=177230&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68499&billStatusActionId=177266&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback