AZ SB1040 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-05 - Chapter 61
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-05 - Chapter 61
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Insurers; notices; methods of delivery
Title
Insurers; notices; methods of delivery
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-05 | Senate | Chapter 61 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-05-19 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (45-15-0-0) |
2020-05-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2020-03-10 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-10 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-09 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2020-03-09 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-03-02 | House | House RA Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-26 | House | House read second time |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to House RA Committee |
2020-02-25 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-01-30 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-1-0) |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Prefile |
Subjects
Definitions
Electronic Communication
Electronic Notices
Insurance - Title 20
Insurers
Methods Of Delivery
Notice
Report
Electronic Communication
Electronic Notices
Insurance - Title 20
Insurers
Methods Of Delivery
Notice
Report
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1108 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 117 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 123 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 1241.03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 1241.05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 1631 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 1632 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 1632.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 1653 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 1654 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 1656 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 1674 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 1676 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 1677 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 1678 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 1693.05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 1694.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 2110 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 2209 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 239 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 240 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 2533 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 2534 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 2535 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 2536 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 2537 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 2609 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 2637 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 367.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 866 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |