AZ SB1038 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Chapter 190
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Chapter 190
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Arizona pioneers' home; regulation
Title
Arizona pioneers' home; regulation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | Senate | Chapter 190 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-04-30 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2019-04-11 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-03-19 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-19 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-18 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2019-03-18 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-07 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2019-02-27 | House | House read second time |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-02-04 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Prefile |
Subjects
Arizona Pioneers Home
Exemptions
Health Care Institutions
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Regulation
State Government - Title 41
Exemptions
Health Care Institutions
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Regulation
State Government - Title 41
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 402 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 421 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 921 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |