AZ SB1036 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-25 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-25 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Solid waste; private enterprise
Title
Solid waste; private enterprise
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Waring [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-25 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2010-02-23 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-23 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-22 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-01-11 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-01 | Senate NRIPD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) | |
2010-01-12 | Referred to Senate NRIPD Committee | |
2010-01-12 | Senate read second time | |
2010-01-11 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-01-11 | Assigned to Senate NRIPD Committee | |
2010-01-11 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |