AZ SB1034 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-07 - Chapter 344
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-07 - Chapter 344
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Assisted living; referral agencies; disclosure
Title
Assisted living; referral agencies; disclosure
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Barto [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-07 | Senate | Chapter 344 |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-04-29 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2021-04-20 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-04-20 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-04-19 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-04-19 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-30 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (13-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-24 | House | House read second time |
2021-03-23 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-03-23 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2021-03-23 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-03-18 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-0-3-0) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-01-04 | Senate | Prefile |
Subjects
Agency
Assisted Living
Disclosure
Fee
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Referral
Referral Agencies
Strike Everything Amendment
Termination Notice
Assisted Living
Disclosure
Fee
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Referral
Referral Agencies
Strike Everything Amendment
Termination Notice