AZ SB1033 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-02-20 - Assigned to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Board of executive clemency; continuation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Board of executive clemency; continuation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-01-26 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-20HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-02-20HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-02-20HouseAssigned to House JPS Committee
2017-02-20HouseAssigned to House JPS Committee
2017-02-20HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2017-01-26HouseTransmit to House
2017-01-26SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2017-01-24SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-01-24SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-01-23SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-01-19SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2017-01-11SenateSenate read second time
2017-01-10SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-01-10SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2017-01-10SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
413017.13Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
413025.13New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback